MA H938 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide insurance coverage for magnetic resonance imaging to certain persons for the detection of breast cancer. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to providing insurance coverage for breast cancer screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H938 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H938.pdf |