MA H933 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposal of sea mammals on metropolitan beaches. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the disposal of sea mammals on metropolitan beaches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | House | Accompanied by S506 |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S506 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H933
S572 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H942 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H1668 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S578 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S572 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S494
H942 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H1668 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S578 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H933 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H933.pdf |