MA H908 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S839
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for using a weapon with intent to strike a dwelling house. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting gunfire directed at dwelling houses
Sponsors
Rep. Rady Mom [D] | Sen. Eileen Donoghue [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] |
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-15 | House | Accompanied by S839 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1999 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S997 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S872 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H884 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S839 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H908
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2575 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1999 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S997 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S872 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H884 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H885 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H737 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S839 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H908
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2575 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H908 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H908.pdf |