MA H908 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. James M. Cantwell of Marshfield, petition of James M. Cantwell that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be authorized to issue a distinctive motor vehicle registration plate to certain veterans awarded the "Legion of Merit"
Title
Providing for a Legion of Merit license plate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4263 |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2012 from 11:30 AM-02:30 PM in A-1 |
2011-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4263 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H908 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10465&generalCourtId=1 |