MA H896 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the availability of immunity to witnesses in the courts of the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.
Title
To enhance the availability of immunity to witnesses in the courts of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D] |
Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S766 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S816 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S864 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S769 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S823 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H718
H897 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S816 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S864 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S769 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S823 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied H718
H897 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H896.pdf |