MA H892 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the imposition of additional costs to cities or towns by the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To assist municipal and district ratepayers
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] |
Rep. Simon Cataldo [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
S1759 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
S1759 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H892.pdf |