MA H888 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3867
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3867
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3867
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Conservation and Recreation to designate a certain water spray deck park within the Melnea A. Cass Recreation Complex in the Roxbury section of the city of Boston as the Nakieka “Kiki” Taylor Water Deck. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating a certain water spray deck park within the Department of Conservation and Recreation’s Melnea A. Cass Recreation Complex in the Roxbury neighborhood of the city of Boston as the “Nakieka “Kiki” Taylor Water Deck”
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3867 |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3867 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H888.pdf |