MA H888 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to energy efficiency in construction, renovation or expansion of schools and libraries. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to school and library buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. William Straus [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4465 |
2012-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4465 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H888 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7841&generalCourtId=1 |