MA H878 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4323
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see H4323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see H4323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to further regulating companies domiciled in the Commonwealth that are required to submit statements of actuarial opinion. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the property and casualty actuarial opinion act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | New draft substituted, see H4323 |
2014-07-22 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2014-07-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2014-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4323 |
2014-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2013 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4323 (Replaced by) 2015-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H878 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H878.pdf |