MA H873 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4721

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 84-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect residents of the Commonwealth from certain government monitoring. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect fundamental freedoms and prohibit discriminatory registration programs

Sponsors

Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D]
Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Sen. Linda Forry [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Juana Matias [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4721
2018-04-19SenateSenate concurred
2018-03-21HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2077 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H971 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4721 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback