MA H871 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3920
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to common summary of payments forms for health care services. Financial Services.
Title
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3920 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3920 (Replaced by) 2016-01-28 - Accompanied S2081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H871.pdf |