MA H87 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S41
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-25 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-25 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to develop recommendations for supporting investments, policies and practices designed to promote equity in agriculture for socially disadvantaged groups. Agriculture.
Title
Promoting equity in agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2023-07-31 | House | Accompanied by S41 |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H94 (Similar To) 2023-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S491 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S461 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2409 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S41 (Replaces) 2023-07-31 - Accompanied H87
S2469 (Similar To) 2023-10-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S491 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S461 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2409 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S41 (Replaces) 2023-07-31 - Accompanied H87
S2469 (Similar To) 2023-10-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H87 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H87.pdf |