MA H87 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Arciero of Westford, a petition of James Arciero and others that the Division of Medical Assistance provide coverage for applied behavior analysis treatments for certain individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to applied behavior analysis services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-05HouseReported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H621 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S356
H128 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H88 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
H127 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4074
H161 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
H2954 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1288 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S53 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2427
H123 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback