MA H862 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the regulation and availability of cottage foods. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote economic opportunities for cottage food entrepreneurs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S533 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2879

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback