MA H86 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the approval by planning boards of subdivision plans in cities and towns. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to planning boards' approval of subdivision plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-04-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H86 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11414&generalCourtId=1 |