MA H855 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mandatory post-release supervision. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing mandatory post release supervision in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H895 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H895 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H855 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H855.pdf |