MA H85 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require pet shops to provide basic pet care information to consumers. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Requiring pet shop owners to provide basic pet care information to consumers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, H4418 |
2011-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H85 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8085&generalCourtId=1 |