MA H845 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S158 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S544 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S113 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1023 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
H695 (Similar To) 2017-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1685 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
H775 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H952 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback