MA H83 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4632
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts data privacy protection act. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
To establish the Massachusetts data privacy protection act
Sponsors
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4632 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 6, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H4632 (Replaced by) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Reported by H4999
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Committee of conference appointed (Crighton-Velis-Fattman), in concurrence
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Reported by H4999
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H83 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H83.pdf |