MA H83 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require family child care licensees to disclose when such licensees are not covered by liability insurance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to family day care disclosures
Sponsors
Rep. Claire Cronin [D] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/17 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H2495 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H83 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H83.pdf |