MA H83 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3984
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3984
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to continuity of care for children and their eligible parents. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Regarding continuity of care for children and their eligible parents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3984 |
2012-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2012 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H3984 (Replaced by) 2012-12-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4533
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H83 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8137&generalCourtId=1 |