MA H821 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5284
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing disclosure of political phone calls. Election Laws.
Title
Providing disclosure of political phone calls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5284 |
2022-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1463 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1571 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S863 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2779
S2108 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S244 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5284 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1463 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1571 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S863 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2779
S2108 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S244 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5284 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H821 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H821.pdf |