MA H801 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to facilitate and simplify grant application procedures for family farms. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To facilitate and simplify grant application procedures for family farms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H802 (Similar To) 2020-05-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H801 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H801.pdf |