MA H801 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act to promote the reduction of green house gas emissions and to reduce the use of fossil fuels for vehicles in the Commonwealth. By Mr. Smizik of Brookline, a petition of Frank I. Smizik and others for the establishment of a clean vehicle emissions incentive program within the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To promote the reduction of green house gas emissions and to reduce the use of fossil fuels for vehicles in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H801 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H801.pdf |