MA H800 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2592
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2592
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2592
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the sale of certain domestic animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Banning the retail sale of cats and dogs in pet shops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2592 |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-22 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H755 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5071
S989 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S2592 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S989 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S2592 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H800 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H800.pdf |