MA H80 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4483
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide an income tax exemption for families caring for their elderly relatives at home. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To provide an income tax exemption for families caring for their elderly relatives at home
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4483 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-16 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Revenue |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4483 (Replaced by) 2014-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H80 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H80.pdf |