MA H788 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the building or expansion of solid waste disposal facilities. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Protecting public drinking water by further regulating solid waste disposal facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4668 |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H4246 (Similar To) 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 188 of the Acts of 2024
H4668 (Replaced by) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4668 (Replaced by) 2024-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H788 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H788.pdf |