MA H782 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation has been replaced by H4481

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt the personal use of milk and raw milk products by owners of cows and goats from certain laws governing the use of said products. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing owners to utilize products from cows or goats

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4481
2013-06-20JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2013 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in David Prouty High School
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H4481 (Replaced by) 2014-09-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback