MA H781 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5013
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the law relative to the use of leghold traps for capturing furbearing animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to beavers
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5013 |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S479 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
H5013 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5013 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H781 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H781.pdf |