MA H772 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of commercial uses in common areas of condominium complexes. Revenue.
Title
Clarifying municipalities' rights to assess real estate taxes on commercial uses in common areas of condominium complexes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2011 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-18 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H772 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9043&generalCourtId=1 |