MA H754 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4745
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - New draft substituted, see H4745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-12 - New draft substituted, see H4745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to agricultural preservation restrictions. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Supporting farm diversification and sustainability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | House | New draft substituted, see H4745 |
2024-06-12 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2024-06-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2024-06-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4745 |
2023-12-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Agriculture |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H4745 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H754.pdf |