MA H754 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S456
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to compute and track the individual and collective lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions of all fuels. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing tracking and reporting requirements for Massachusetts transportation fuels and associated greenhouse gas emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied S456 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S456 (Replaced by) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H485 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H486 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H487 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2681 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4028
H2826 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H485 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H486 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H487 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2681 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4028
H2826 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H754.pdf |