MA H748 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H04990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H04990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to establish a forestry industry economic stimulus program
Title
Establish a forestry industry economic stimulus program
Sponsors
Rep. Denis Guyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | Accompanied a study order, see H04990 | |
2010-05-20 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, June 15, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/16 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room B1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4990 (Replaced by) 2010-08-16 - Discharged to the House Committee On Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00748.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00748.htm |