MA H740 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-12)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to alimony. The Judiciary.
Title
Reforming alimony in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2050 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3088 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H974 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3084 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3120 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2647 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2558 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H477 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3088 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H974 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3084 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3120 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2647 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2558 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H477 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H740 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H740.pdf |