MA H736 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4780
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Garlick of Needham, a petition of Denise C. Garlick and others that the Division of Health Care Facility Licensure and Certification be authorized to establish and implement a prescribed process and program for providing training and education to certain licensed providers. Elder Affairs.
Title
Promoting the betterment of resident health and safety in long term care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4780 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S403 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1434 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1460 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S403 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1434 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H736 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H736.pdf |