MA H735 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-25 - Accompanied S412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-25 - Accompanied S412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the personal needs allowance for certain elderly and disabled residents residing in licensed medical facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Increasing the personal needs allowance for residents of long term care facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | Accompanied S412 |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S412 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1482 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S1482 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H735.pdf |