MA H735 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4320
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the development and promulgation of regulations governing underground storage tanks. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the development and promulgation of regulations governing underground storage tanks
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4320 |
2013-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4320 (Replaced by) 2014-07-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H735 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H735.pdf |