MA H732 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the strategic preparedness stockpiles. Emergency Preparedness and Management.
Title
To strengthen the Commonwealth's strategic preparedness stockpiles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Emergency Preparedness and Management |
Same As/Similar To
H2314 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
H2245 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1775 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1431 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4387 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2245 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H1775 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1431 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4387 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H732 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H732.pdf |