MA H722 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to trespassing or loitering on school grounds. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the safety of school grounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S961 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
S2072 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - New draft substituted, see S2167
H399 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H882 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2167 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - For House actions, see H3952
H3952 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2018
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4913 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
S2072 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - New draft substituted, see S2167
H399 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H882 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2167 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - For House actions, see H3952
H3952 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2018
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4913 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H722 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H722.pdf |