MA H720 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the psychiatric evaluation and treatment of certain mentally ill persons alleged to have committed assault or assault and battery. The Judiciary.
Title
To preserve access to inpatient mental health services for individuals with mental illness
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
H3343 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2412 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2406 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1063 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S828 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S984 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H795 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2342 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3343 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2412 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2406 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1063 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S828 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S984 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H795 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2342 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H720.pdf |