MA H717 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4733

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to ballot question fiscal transparency. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving fiscal transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4733
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H4023 (Similar To) 2023-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2023
H4112 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4203 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2544 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2024
H4272 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4733 (Replaced by) 2024-07-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback