MA H708 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to including the events of Black History instruction at schools and institutions of higher education. Education.
Title
Concerning education in honor of Byron Rushing
Sponsors
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] | Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Rep. Brandy Fluker Oakley [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Sen. Nick Collins [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4539 |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H708 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H708.pdf |