MA H707 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the use of hydraulic fracturing to stimulate the extraction of natural gas. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To regulate hydraulic fracturing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3796 |
2013-11-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2013 from 04:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3796 (Replaced by) 2013-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H707 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H707.pdf |