MA H705 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act protecting the Commonwealth's lakes and ponds By Mr. Garballey of Arlington, a petition of Sean Garballey and others protecting lakes and ponds by establishing an invasive aquatic plant management fund. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting the Commonwealth's lakes and ponds
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4417 |
2013-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4417 (Replaced by) 2014-08-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H705 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H705.pdf |