MA H704 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1340
Note: Legislation replaced by H4217
Note: Legislation replaced by H4217
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the eligibility of certain faculty for contributory group insurance of public higher educational institutions. Public Service.
Title
Relative to eligibility for state group health insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-25 | House | New draft substituted, see H4217 |
2012-07-25 | House | Read second |
2012-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-11 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title, H4217 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-05-25 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-05-25 | House | Accompanied by S1340 |
2011-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:10 PM-04:40 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1340 (Replaces) 2011-05-25 - Accompanied H704
H4217 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
H4217 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H704 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9770&generalCourtId=1 |