MA H703 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to minimum pensions for retirees of city, town, county, region, district or authority retirement systems. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the minimum pension for retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-05-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-25 | House | Accompanied by S1289 |
2011-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:10 PM-04:40 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1289 (Replaces) 2011-05-25 - Accompanied H703
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H703 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9749&generalCourtId=1 |