MA H700 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing an elementary and secondary school robotics grant program. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an elementary and secondary school robotics grant program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24JointHearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H685 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H614 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4643
H4643 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback