MA H699 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 183 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 183 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the inspection of underground tanks used for the storage of fluids. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to certain tanks used for the storage of fluids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 183 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-12-09 | House | Enacted |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-11-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-18 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committe on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-07-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H699 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H699.pdf |