MA H68 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to internet service outages. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Relative to internet service outages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H1769 (Similar To) 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3140 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2539 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4536 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted, in concurrence
H3140 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2539 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4536 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H68 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H68.pdf |