MA H68 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4559

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to expanding sports wagering in the Commonwealth (House, No. 68). January 22nd 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding sports wagering in the Commonwealth

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4559
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Friday February 28, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H366 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
S229 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
S201 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H372 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H373 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback